This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 02/26/2022 at 12:05:54 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - SPELLER, MYRIAH MARLENE

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - SPELLER, MYRIAH MARLENE. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Ocoee Branch located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Eric H DuBois and Elizabeth Gibson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-W

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Eric H DuBois

Elizabeth Gibson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MYRIAH MARLENE SPELLER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

RACHEL MATTIE

 

Court Documents

Information Filed

Information Filed

Summons Issued

Summons Issued

Memorandum

Memorandum

NOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

NOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

Notice Setting Hearing

Notice Setting Hearing

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Waiver of Appearance at PreTrial Conference

Waiver of Appearance at PreTrial Conference

HEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - DuBois, Eric H (Actual: DuBois, Eric H)

HEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - DuBois, Eric H (Actual: DuBois, Eric H)

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

HEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - DuBois, Eric H (Actual: DuBois, Eric H)

HEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - DuBois, Eric H (Actual: DuBois, Eric H)

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

HEARING - Status Hearing - DuBois, Eric H (Actual: DuBois, Eric H)

HEARING - Status Hearing - DuBois, Eric H (Actual: DuBois, Eric H)

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Pre-Trial Diversion Contract

Pre-Trial Diversion Contract

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Diversion Contract

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • HearingHearing: Status Hearing - DuBois, Eric H (Actual: DuBois, Eric H) 77763694; Location: Room 10-B On The 10th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDisposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketWaiver of Speedy Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCase Held in Abeyance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDefendant Referred to PreTrial Diversion; Comments: You will Receive a Letter from Pre-Trial Diversion with Further Instructions.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING - Status Hearing - DuBois, Eric H (Actual: DuBois, Eric H)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Copy Sent to Private Attorney; Comments: Document Delivery: RACHEL ANN MATTIE ESQ - Sent 9/8/2021 4:26:52 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Supplemental Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Arraignment - Adams, Martha C; Location: Ocoee Courtroom W-9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Arraignment - Adams, Martha C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Copy Sent to Private Attorney; Comments: Document Delivery: RACHEL ANN MATTIE ESQ - Sent 6/22/2021 3:10:28 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Setting Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MATTIE, RACHEL