This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 02/26/2022 at 08:05:38 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - SMITH, LLOYD

Case Summary

On 05/16/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - SMITH, LLOYD. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Ocoee Branch located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wayne J Shoemaker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-W

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wayne J Shoemaker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

LLOYD SMITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

Court Minutes

Court Minutes; Comments: IA

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

No Contact Order

No Contact Order

BOND - Charge 1 Cash Bond 807762

BOND - Charge 1 Cash Bond 807762

Complaint

Complaint

HEARING - Arraignment - DuBois, Eric H (Actual: DuBois, Eric H)

HEARING - Arraignment - DuBois, Eric H (Actual: DuBois, Eric H)

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

No Information Notice

No Information Notice

Transmittal to Accounting - Release Cash Bond

Transmittal to Accounting - Release Cash Bond

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-No Bill/No Information Pre-Trial Conference - Shoemaker, Wayne J; Location: Room 7-C On The 7th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-No Bill/No Information Pre-Trial Conference - Shoemaker, Wayne J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: SMITH, LLOYD; Amount: -500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransmittal to Accounting - Release Cash Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Cash Bond 807762

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: -50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNo Information Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Comments: Mailed to Cash Bond Depositor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • HearingHearing: Arraignment - DuBois, Eric H (Actual: DuBois, Eric H) 75644759; Location: Ocoee Courtroom W-9

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING - Arraignment - DuBois, Eric H (Actual: DuBois, Eric H)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketBond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Cash Bond 807762

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2021
  • DocketFirst Appearance Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNo Contact Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAdvice to Defendant, First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes; Comments: IA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less