This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 01/26/2019 at 11:02:34 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - SMITH, COLIN EDWARD

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - SMITH, COLIN EDWARD. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Traver. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Dan Traver

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

COLIN EDWARD SMITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint

Court Minutes

Court Minutes; Comments: IA

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond BB5772703

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond BB5772703

First Appearance Information Sheet

First Appearance Information Sheet

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

BOND - Charge 3 Surety Bond BB5772705

BOND - Charge 3 Surety Bond BB5772705

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

BOND - Charge 4 Surety Bond BB5772706

BOND - Charge 4 Surety Bond BB5772706

BOND - Charge 2 Surety Bond BB5772704

BOND - Charge 2 Surety Bond BB5772704

BOND - Charge 5 Surety Bond BB5772707

BOND - Charge 5 Surety Bond BB5772707

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2019
  • Bond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Bond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Bond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Bond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Bond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond BB5772703

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BOND - Charge 2 Surety Bond BB5772704

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BOND - Charge 3 Surety Bond BB5772705

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BOND - Charge 4 Surety Bond BB5772706

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BOND - Charge 5 Surety Bond BB5772707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • First Appearance Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Court Minutes; Comments: IA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less