This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 02/25/2022 at 22:12:13 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - SHELTON, STARDE AHADA

Case Summary

On 04/19/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - SHELTON, STARDE AHADA. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Ocoee Branch located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian F Duckworth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-W

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian F Duckworth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

STARDE AHADA SHELTON

 

Court Documents

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond PSE15922977

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond PSE15922977

Complaint

Complaint

Information Filed

Information Filed

Memorandum

Memorandum

HEARING - Arraignment - Miller, W Michael (Actual: Miller, W Michael)

HEARING - Arraignment - Miller, W Michael (Actual: Miller, W Michael)

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

HEARING - Arraignment - McGinnis, Adam (Actual: McGinnis, Adam)

HEARING - Arraignment - McGinnis, Adam (Actual: McGinnis, Adam)

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Change of Address

Pre-Trial Diversion Rejection

Pre-Trial Diversion Rejection

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Diversion Rejection

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDisposition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • HearingHearing: Arraignment - McGinnis, Adam (Actual: McGinnis, Adam) 75500625; Location: Ocoee Courtroom W-9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketWaiver of Speedy Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCase Held in Abeyance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketDefendant Referred to PreTrial Diversion; Comments: You will Receive a Letter from Pre-Trial Diversion with Further Instructions.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING - Arraignment - McGinnis, Adam (Actual: McGinnis, Adam)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • HearingHearing: Arraignment - Miller, W Michael (Actual: Miller, W Michael) 75115285; Location: Ocoee Courtroom W-9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Copy to Bondsman; Comments: Document Delivery: Recipient: QUICK RELEASE BAIL BONDS (SANFORD) Sent, May 19 2021 4:21PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketPer the Court:; Comments: Notice to Bondsman and State

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketWaiver of Speedy Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING - Arraignment - Miller, W Michael (Actual: Miller, W Michael)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformation Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketBond Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond PSE15922977

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less