This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/22/2020 at 15:21:52 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - RICHEMOND, KERVENS

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - RICHEMOND, KERVENS. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Criminal Division A and Andrew Bain. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Criminal Division A

Andrew Bain

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

KERVENS RICHEMOND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

HEARING - Arraignment - Bain, Andrew (Actual: Bain, Andrew)

HEARING - Arraignment - Bain, Andrew (Actual: Bain, Andrew)

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond PSE1547058

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond PSE1547058

Information Filed

Information Filed

Memorandum

Memorandum

Court Minutes

Court Minutes; Comments: IA

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Out on Bond and Non-Monetary Release Form

Out on Bond and Non-Monetary Release Form; Comments: 2020-MM-6947-A-O

Complaint

Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2020
  • HearingHearing: Arraignment - Bain, Andrew (Actual: Bain, Andrew) 72295585; Location: Room 6-C On The 6th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Forfeiture; Comments: Bond is to be forfeited.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketFailure to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketIssue Capias

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketWaiver of Speedy Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING - Arraignment - Bain, Andrew (Actual: Bain, Andrew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond PSE1547058

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketBond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond PSE1547058

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes; Comments: IA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketFirst Appearance Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAdvice to Defendant, First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOut on Bond and Non-Monetary Release Form; Comments: 2020-MM-6947-A-O

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less