This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 01/26/2019 at 11:01:40 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - RAGLAND, ALEXANDER

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - RAGLAND, ALEXANDER. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is John E Jordan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

John E Jordan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ALEXANDER RAGLAND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond BB5772676

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond BB5772676

Complaint

Complaint

Court Minutes

Court Minutes; Comments: IA

First Appearance Information Sheet

First Appearance Information Sheet

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

Written Plea of Not Guilty; Waiver of Arraignment

Written Plea of Not Guilty; Waiver of Arraignment

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Written Plea of Not Guilty; Waiver of Arraignment

Written Plea of Not Guilty; Waiver of Arraignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Written Plea of Not Guilty; Waiver of Arraignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Written Plea of Not Guilty; Waiver of Arraignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Bond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • First Appearance Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond BB5772676

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Court Minutes; Comments: IA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less