This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 02/25/2022 at 18:36:04 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - PRYOR, DELVIN DEMETRE

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - PRYOR, DELVIN DEMETRE. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Ocoee Branch located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeanette D Bigney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-W

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Jeanette D Bigney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

DELVIN DEMETRE PRYOR

 

Court Documents

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

HEARING - Arraignment - Jewett, Steve (Actual: Jewett, Steve)

HEARING - Arraignment - Jewett, Steve (Actual: Jewett, Steve)

Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Issued

Summons Issued

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

HEARING - Arraignment - Bigney, Jeanette D (Actual: Bigney, Jeanette D)

HEARING - Arraignment - Bigney, Jeanette D (Actual: Bigney, Jeanette D)

Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Issued

Summons Issued

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

HEARING - Arraignment - Cameron, Andrew L (Actual: Cameron, Andrew L)

HEARING - Arraignment - Cameron, Andrew L (Actual: Cameron, Andrew L)

Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Issued

Summons Issued

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

HEARING - Arraignment - Division A, Criminal (Actual: Division A, Criminal)

HEARING - Arraignment - Division A, Criminal (Actual: Division A, Criminal)

Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Returned Unserved

Memorandum

Memorandum

Summons Issued

Summons Issued

Information Filed

Information Filed

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • HearingHearing: Arraignment - Jewett, Steve (Actual: Jewett, Steve) 79395935; Location: Ocoee Courtroom W-9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketReturned to State to Perfect Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING - Arraignment - Jewett, Steve (Actual: Jewett, Steve)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • HearingHearing: Arraignment - Bigney, Jeanette D (Actual: Bigney, Jeanette D) 78861842; Location: Ocoee Courtroom W-9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketReturned to State to Perfect Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING - Arraignment - Bigney, Jeanette D (Actual: Bigney, Jeanette D)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • HearingHearing: Arraignment - Division A, Criminal (Actual: Division A, Criminal) 74724259; Location: Ocoee Courtroom W-9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketReturned to State to Perfect Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING - Arraignment - Division A, Criminal (Actual: Division A, Criminal)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformation Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less