This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 07/30/2022 at 15:04:55 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - PROUDFOOT, DAVID EMERSON

Case Summary

On 05/31/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - PROUDFOOT, DAVID EMERSON. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Patricia L Strowbridge. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Patricia L Strowbridge

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

DAVID EMERSON PROUDFOOT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

Court Minutes

Court Minutes; Comments: IA

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Application for Determining Indigent Status

Application for Determining Indigent Status

Affidavit to Issue Warrant

Affidavit to Issue Warrant

Warrant Issued Returnable Instanter

Warrant Issued Returnable Instanter

Arrest Affidavit

Arrest Affidavit

Warrant Returned Served

Warrant Returned Served

Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

Written Plea of Not Guilty; Waiver of Arraignment

Written Plea of Not Guilty; Waiver of Arraignment

Request for Administrative Transfer

Request for Administrative Transfer

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2022
  • DocketFirst Appearance Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Administrative Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDisposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketFirst Appearance Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWritten Plea of Not Guilty; Waiver of Arraignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • HearingHearing: Hearing; Location: Jail 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketFirst Appearance Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWarrant Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Determining Indigent Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAdvice to Defendant, First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes; Comments: IA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArrest Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketWarrant/Capias Issued - Non Public

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWarrant Issued Returnable Instanter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit to Issue Warrant

    Read MoreRead Less