This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 02/26/2022 at 07:51:53 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - PHILIPPE, FRANTZ

Case Summary

On 05/15/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - PHILIPPE, FRANTZ. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Ocoee Branch located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wayne J Shoemaker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-W

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wayne J Shoemaker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

FRANTZ PHILIPPE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

DAVID BIGNEY

 

Court Documents

Court Minutes

Court Minutes; Comments: IA

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

No Contact Order

No Contact Order

BOND - Charge 1 Cash Bond 807760

BOND - Charge 1 Cash Bond 807760

Complaint

Complaint

NOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

NOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

NOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

NOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

Notice of Discovery

Notice of Discovery

Demand for Disclosure

Demand for Disclosure; Comments: of Criminal Records

Demand for Disclosure

Demand for Disclosure; Comments: for Exculpatory Information

No Information Notice

No Information Notice

Transmittal to Accounting - Release Cash Bond

Transmittal to Accounting - Release Cash Bond

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2021
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-No Bill/No Information Arraignment - DuBois, Eric H; Location: Ocoee Courtroom W-9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-No Bill/No Information Arraignment - DuBois, Eric H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: PHILIPPE, JONATHAN; Amount: -100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransmittal to Accounting - Release Cash Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketBond Discharged; Comments: 807760

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Cash Bond 807760

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNo Information Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Disclosure; Comments: for Exculpatory Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Disclosure; Comments: of Criminal Records

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 3.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketBond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Cash Bond 807760

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2021
  • DocketFirst Appearance Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNo Contact Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAdvice to Defendant, First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes; Comments: IA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID BIGNEY