This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 12/14/2021 at 15:09:40 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - PASO, BIAGIO

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - PASO, BIAGIO. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Ocoee Branch located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew L Cameron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-W

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Andrew L Cameron

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BIAGIO PASO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

JOSE TORROELLA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint

BOND - Charge 1 Cash Bond 809685

BOND - Charge 1 Cash Bond 809685

Information Filed

Information Filed

Memorandum

Memorandum

Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance

Notice Setting Hearing

Notice Setting Hearing

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Provision of Witness List

Notice of Provision of Witness List

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • HearingHearing: Virtual Pre-Trial Conference - Cameron, Andrew L; Location: Room 9-B On The 9th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketHEARING - Virtual Pre-Trial Conference - Cameron, Andrew L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Supplemental Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Provision of Witness List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Arraignment - Johnson, David P; Location: Ocoee Courtroom W-9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Arraignment - Johnson, David P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Supplemental Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Supplemental Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Copy Sent to Bondsman; Comments: Document Delivery: GUSTAVO DAVID LUGOMEDRANO - Sent 11/15/2021 8:15:24 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Copy Sent to Private Attorney; Comments: Document Delivery: JOSE FRANCISCO TORROELLA ESQ - Sent 11/15/2021 8:13:42 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Setting Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketBond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Cash Bond 809685

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TORROELLA, JOSE F