This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 01/26/2019 at 11:05:54 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - MURRAY, KATELLYN DIANE

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - MURRAY, KATELLYN DIANE. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Traver. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Dan Traver

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

KATELLYN DIANE MURRAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

Court Minutes

Court Minutes; Comments: IA

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond BB5772723

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond BB5772723

Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR FAVORABLE AND IMPEACHMENT INFORMATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH BRADY

First Appearance Information Sheet

First Appearance Information Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR FAVORABLE AND IMPEACHMENT INFORMATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH BRADY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Bond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond BB5772723

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • First Appearance Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Court Minutes; Comments: IA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less