This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 01/05/2019 at 08:38:10 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - MILOR, FREDO JUNIOR

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - MILOR, FREDO JUNIOR. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Maureen A Bell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Maureen A Bell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

FREDO JUNIOR MILOR

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond BB5772641

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond BB5772641

Court Minutes

Court Minutes; Comments: IA

First Appearance Information Sheet

First Appearance Information Sheet

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2019
  • HEARING - Arraignment - Division A, Criminal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • First Appearance Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Bond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond BB5772641

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Court Minutes; Comments: IA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less