This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/22/2020 at 15:20:27 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - MERCADOMALDONADO, ARMANDO JOEL

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - MERCADOMALDONADO, ARMANDO JOEL. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Apopka Branch located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Criminal Division A and Wayne J Shoemaker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-A

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Apopka Branch

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Criminal Division A

Wayne J Shoemaker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ARMANDO JOEL MERCADOMALDONADO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

No Information Notice

No Information Notice

Release Order

Release Order; Comments: Spanish

Release Order

Release Order; Comments: English

No Contact Order

No Contact Order

Court Minutes

Court Minutes; Comments: IA

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Complaint

Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2020
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-No Bill/No Information Arraignment - McGinnis, Adam; Location: Ocoee Courtroom W-9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-No Bill/No Information Arraignment - McGinnis, Adam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNo Information Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Comments: Spanish

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Comments: English

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketFirst Appearance Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNo Contact Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes; Comments: IA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAdvice to Defendant, First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less