This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 03/02/2023 at 11:33:35 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - MCNAIRFIELDS, GLEN

Case Summary

On 08/28/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - MCNAIRFIELDS, GLEN. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Adam McGinnis. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-O

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Adam McGinnis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

GLEN MCNAIRFIELDS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

NICHOLAS SEIDULE

 

Court Documents

Court Minutes

Court Minutes; Comments: IA

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

No Contact Order

No Contact Order

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond U521446821

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond U521446821

Electronic Copy Sent to Bondsman

Electronic Copy Sent to Bondsman; Comments: Document Delivery: POLAKOFF BAIL BONDS - Sent 8/30/2022 12:56:35 PM

Complaint

Complaint

NOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

NOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

No Information Notice

No Information Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2022
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-No Bill/No Information Arraignment - McGinnis, Adam 83758068; Location: Room 4-E On The 4th Floor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-No Bill/No Information Arraignment - McGinnis, Adam

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketBond Discharged

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond U521446821

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNo Information Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Copy Sent to Bondsman; Comments: Document Delivery: POLAKOFF BAIL BONDS - Sent 8/30/2022 12:56:35 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketBond Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond U521446821

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • HearingHearing: Hearing; Location: Jail 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketFirst Appearance Information Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNo Contact Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAdvice to Defendant, First Appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes; Comments: IA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less