This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 02/25/2022 at 20:57:00 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - MADAR-ST CLAIR, SADINAZ

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - MADAR-ST CLAIR, SADINAZ. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Ocoee Branch located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Evellen H Jewett. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-W

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Evellen H Jewett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SADINAZ MADAR-ST CLAIR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

NICHOLAS SEIDULE

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued

Summons Issued

Information Filed

Information Filed

Memorandum

Memorandum

NOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

NOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

Notice Setting Hearing

Notice Setting Hearing

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

HEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - Jewett, Evellen H (Actual: Jewett, Evellen H)

HEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - Jewett, Evellen H (Actual: Jewett, Evellen H)

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Change of Address

Pre-Trial Diversion Contract

Pre-Trial Diversion Contract

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Diversion Contract

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Conference - Jewett, Evellen H (Actual: Jewett, Evellen H) 75816662; Location: Room 9-C On The 9th Floor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketDisposition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketPer the Court:; Comments: Report any Address Changes within 48 Hours to the Clerks Office and the State.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketWaiver of Speedy Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCase Held in Abeyance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketDefendant Referred to PreTrial Diversion; Comments: You will Receive a Letter from Pre-Trial Diversion with Further Instructions.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Supplemental Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Arraignment - Allen, Faye L; Location: Ocoee Courtroom W-9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Arraignment - Allen, Faye L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Copy to Private Attorney; Comments: Document Delivery: Recipient: NICHOLAS DONALD SEIDULE ESQ Sent, Apr 29 2021 3:15PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Setting Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformation Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Seidule, Nicholas Donald