This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/22/2020 at 15:22:04 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - LUNA, JOEHASEN

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - LUNA, JOEHASEN. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Criminal Division A and Wayne J Shoemaker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Criminal Division A

Wayne J Shoemaker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

JOEHASEN LUNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

HEARING - CANCELED-No Bill/No Information Arraignment - Division A, Criminal

HEARING - CANCELED-No Bill/No Information Arraignment - Division A, Criminal

No Information Notice

No Information Notice

Release Order

Release Order

No Contact Order

No Contact Order

Court Minutes

Court Minutes; Comments: IA

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Complaint

Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-No Bill/No Information Arraignment - Division A, Criminal 71677412; Location: Courtroom To Be Determined

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-No Bill/No Information Arraignment - Division A, Criminal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNo Information Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketFirst Appearance Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNo Contact Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes; Comments: IA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAdvice to Defendant, First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less