This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 01/26/2019 at 11:04:06 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - LOVE, CALVIN

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - LOVE, CALVIN. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Tom Young. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Tom Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

CALVIN LOVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint

First Appearance Information Sheet

First Appearance Information Sheet

Notice of Invocation of Constitutional Rights

Notice of Invocation of Constitutional Rights

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

Court Minutes

Court Minutes; Comments: IA

First Appearance Information Sheet

First Appearance Information Sheet

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2019
  • Case Closed-Consolidated With; Comments: 2018-CF-17823

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Disposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • First Appearance Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • First Appearance Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Invocation of Constitutional Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Court Minutes; Comments: IA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: -50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less