This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 02/25/2022 at 14:46:36 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - LEDEZMA, JOSE

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - LEDEZMA, JOSE. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Ocoee Branch located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeanette D Bigney. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-W

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Jeanette D Bigney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

JOSE LEDEZMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond U521101660

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond U521101660

Complete Case Transferred

Complete Case Transferred; Comments: From 2021-CF-3001-A-O

Information Filed

Information Filed

Notice

Notice

Electronic Copy to Bondsman

Electronic Copy to Bondsman; Comments: Document Delivery: Recipient: NATIVE BAIL BONDS Sent, Apr 5 2021 12:11PM

Memorandum

Memorandum

Correspondence

Correspondence; Comments: FROM CORRECTIONS - DRUG & ALCOHOL TESTING FOR NON-SUPERVISED PRETRIAL RELEASE DEFENDANTS

HEARING - Arraignment - Division A, Criminal (Actual: Division A, Criminal)

HEARING - Arraignment - Division A, Criminal (Actual: Division A, Criminal)

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Nolle Prosequi

Nolle Prosequi

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Conference - Jewett, Steve; Location: Room 4-B On The 4th Floor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Conference - Jewett, Steve

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond U521101660

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • HearingHearing: Arraignment - Division A, Criminal (Actual: Division A, Criminal) 74723298; Location: Ocoee Courtroom W-9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • HearingHearing: Arraignment - Jewett, Steve (Actual: Jewett, Steve); Location: Ocoee Courtroom W-9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNolle Prosequi

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDisposition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketState Orally Announced a Nolle Prosequi in Open Court; Comments: as to Counts: 1 Completed PTD Video

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketHEARING - Arraignment - Jewett, Steve (Actual: Jewett, Steve)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING - Arraignment - Division A, Criminal (Actual: Division A, Criminal)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence; Comments: FROM CORRECTIONS - DRUG & ALCOHOL TESTING FOR NON-SUPERVISED PRETRIAL RELEASE DEFENDANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Copy to Bondsman; Comments: Document Delivery: Recipient: NATIVE BAIL BONDS Sent, Apr 5 2021 12:11PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformation Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplete Case Transferred; Comments: From 2021-CF-3001-A-O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketBond Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond U521101660

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less