This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 02/26/2022 at 00:41:06 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - KEITH, MCDERYL LANE

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - KEITH, MCDERYL LANE. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Ocoee Branch located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Adam McGinnis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-W

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Adam McGinnis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MCDERYL LANE KEITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

HEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - McGinnis, Adam (Actual: McGinnis, Adam)

HEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - McGinnis, Adam (Actual: McGinnis, Adam)

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

HEARING - Status Hearing - McGinnis, Adam (Actual: McGinnis, Adam)

HEARING - Status Hearing - McGinnis, Adam (Actual: McGinnis, Adam)

Order Appointing Experts to Determine Competency and Sanity

Order Appointing Experts to Determine Competency and Sanity

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

HEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - McGinnis, Adam (Actual: McGinnis, Adam)

HEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - McGinnis, Adam (Actual: McGinnis, Adam)

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

HEARING - Arraignment - DuBois, Eric H (Actual: DuBois, Eric H)

HEARING - Arraignment - DuBois, Eric H (Actual: DuBois, Eric H)

Returned Mail

Returned Mail

Memorandum

Memorandum

HEARING - Arraignment - Division A, Criminal

HEARING - Arraignment - Division A, Criminal

ROR Form - Orange County Corrections

ROR Form - Orange County Corrections

Order Release on Own Recognizance

Order Release on Own Recognizance; Comments: GRANTED

Motion for Release on Recognizance

Motion for Release on Recognizance

Information Filed

Information Filed

Complaint

Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • HearingHearing: Competency Hearing - McGinnis, Adam; Location: Room 4-E On The 4th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Competency Hearing - McGinnis, Adam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Conference - McGinnis, Adam (Actual: McGinnis, Adam) 79569825; Location: Room 4-E On The 4th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketPer the Court:; Comments: This hearing will be held VIRTUALLY. If you have any further questions regarding your virtual hearing, please contact Kathy Hoffman, Judicial Assistant at ctjakh1@ocnjcc.org. It is your responsibility to contact the Judicial Assistant at least two business days prior to your hearing to confirm they have your correct email address.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - McGinnis, Adam (Actual: McGinnis, Adam)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • HearingHearing: Competency Hearing - McGinnis, Adam (Actual: McGinnis, Adam) 79207541; Location: Room 4-E On The 4th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketPsychiatric/Mental Health Evaluation and Counseling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketPer the Court:; Comments: This hearing will be held VIRTUALLY. If you have any further questions regarding your virtual hearing, please contact Kathy Hoffman, Judicial Assistant at ctjakh1@ocnjcc.org. It is your responsibility to contact the Judicial Assistant at least two business days prior to your hearing to confirm they have your correct email address.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROR Form - Orange County Corrections

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled In Jail Arraignment - Blechman, Deb S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Release on Own Recognizance; Comments: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Release on Recognizance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketFirst Appearance Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes; Comments: IA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAdvice to Defendant, First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less