This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 02/26/2022 at 11:47:36 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - KANE, MATTHEW

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - KANE, MATTHEW. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Ocoee Branch located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Evellen H Jewett and Wayne J Shoemaker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-W

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Evellen H Jewett

Wayne J Shoemaker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MATTHEW KANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

ADAM POLLACK

 

Court Documents

Nolle Prosequi

Nolle Prosequi

Notice of Provision of Witness List

Notice of Provision of Witness List

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

HEARING - Status Hearing - Shoemaker, Wayne J (Actual: Shoemaker, Wayne J)

HEARING - Status Hearing - Shoemaker, Wayne J (Actual: Shoemaker, Wayne J)

Order

Order

Motion for Continuance

Motion for Continuance

Order for Continuance Granted

Order for Continuance Granted

Motion for Continuance

Motion for Continuance

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Memorandum

Memorandum; Comments: Amended

Information Filed

Information Filed; Comments: Amended

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

HEARING - Status Hearing - Shoemaker, Wayne J (Actual: Shoemaker, Wayne J)

HEARING - Status Hearing - Shoemaker, Wayne J (Actual: Shoemaker, Wayne J)

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

HEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - Shoemaker, Wayne J (Actual: Shoemaker, Wayne J)

HEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - Shoemaker, Wayne J (Actual: Shoemaker, Wayne J)

Demand-Notice of Intention-Claim Alibi

Demand-Notice of Intention-Claim Alibi

Notice Setting Hearing

Notice Setting Hearing

Waiver of Appearance at PreTrial Conference

Waiver of Appearance at PreTrial Conference

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Conference - Shoemaker, Wayne J; Location: Room 7-C On The 7th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Conference - Shoemaker, Wayne J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketDisposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNolle Prosequi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Provision of Witness List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Copy Sent to Private Attorney; Comments: Document Delivery: ADAM LLOYD POLLACK ESQ - Sent 9/9/2021 12:22:35 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • HearingHearing: Status Hearing - Shoemaker, Wayne J (Actual: Shoemaker, Wayne J) 77264948; Location: Room 7-C On The 7th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING - Status Hearing - Shoemaker, Wayne J (Actual: Shoemaker, Wayne J)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Trial - Shoemaker, Wayne J; Location: Room 7-C On The 7th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • HearingHearing: Arraignment - DuBois, Eric H (Actual: DuBois, Eric H) 75645136; Location: Ocoee Courtroom W-9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketReturned to State to Perfect Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING - Arraignment - DuBois, Eric H (Actual: DuBois, Eric H)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAM POLLACK