This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 09/08/2020 at 15:20:05 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - JORDAN, ADRIAN MAURICE

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - JORDAN, ADRIAN MAURICE. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Apopka Branch located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Criminal Division A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-A

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Apopka Branch

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Criminal Division A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ADRIAN MAURICE JORDAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

Notice Setting Hearing

Notice Setting Hearing; Comments: Arg

Information Filed

Information Filed

Memorandum

Memorandum

Court Minutes

Court Minutes; Comments: IA

Complaint

Complaint

ROR Form - Orange County Corrections

ROR Form - Orange County Corrections

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • HearingHearing: Arraignment - Arraignments, Traffic; Location: Room 4-C On The 4th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketHEARING - Arraignment - Arraignments, Traffic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Setting Hearing; Comments: Arg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketTo Be Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROR Form - Orange County Corrections

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes; Comments: IA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2020
  • DocketFirst Appearance Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAdvice to Defendant, First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less