This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/06/2021 at 00:30:37 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - HUANG, JIAN PENG

Case Summary

On 12/26/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - HUANG, JIAN PENG. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Bob LeBlanc. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Bob LeBlanc

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

JIAN PENG HUANG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

LYLE MAZIN

 

Court Documents

Electronic Copy to Private Attorney

Electronic Copy to Private Attorney; Comments: Document Delivery: Recipient: LYLE BARRISTER MAZIN ESQ Sent, Mar 2 2021 3:17PM

Electronic Copy to Bondsman

Electronic Copy to Bondsman; Comments: Document Delivery: Recipient: JIAN W HUANG Sent, Mar 2 2021 4:21PM

Citation Filed

Citation Filed; Comments: AE3PN7E

Memorandum

Memorandum

Information Filed

Information Filed

Complaint

Complaint

Demand for Discovery

Demand for Discovery; Comments: AND DISCLOSURE OF BRADY MATERIAL

NOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

NOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,; Comments: REQUEST FOR A COPY OF CHARGE WAIVER OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES,

BOND - Charge 1 Cash Bond 805919

BOND - Charge 1 Cash Bond 805919

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • HearingHearing: Arraignment - LeBlanc, Bob; Location: Room 19-A on the 19th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketHEARING - Arraignment - LeBlanc, Bob

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Copy to Private Attorney; Comments: Document Delivery: Recipient: LYLE BARRISTER MAZIN ESQ Sent, Mar 2 2021 3:17PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Copy to Bondsman; Comments: Document Delivery: Recipient: JIAN W HUANG Sent, Mar 2 2021 4:21PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation Filed; Comments: AE3PN7E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketComplete Case Transferred; Comments: FROM 2020-CT-8011-A-O

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Discovery; Comments: AND DISCLOSURE OF BRADY MATERIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,; Comments: REQUEST FOR A COPY OF CHARGE WAIVER OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketBond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketBond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketBOND - Charge 2 Cash Bond 805920

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Cash Bond 805919

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LYLE MAZIN