This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 07/26/2022 at 15:04:26 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - HERNANDEZ LUCERO, MARGARITO

Case Summary

On 05/27/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - HERNANDEZ LUCERO, MARGARITO. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Chad K Alvaro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Chad K Alvaro

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MARGARITO HERNANDEZ LUCERO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

CARLOS MELENDEZ

 

Court Documents

Electronic Copy Sent to Private Attorney

Electronic Copy Sent to Private Attorney; Comments: Document Delivery: CARLOS J MELENDEZ ESQ - Sent 7/15/2022 5:45:34 PM

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

BOND - Charge 3 Cash Bond 00813240

BOND - Charge 3 Cash Bond 00813240

BOND - Charge 2 Cash Bond 00813242

BOND - Charge 2 Cash Bond 00813242

BOND - Charge 1 Cash Bond 00813235 - 00813239

BOND - Charge 1 Cash Bond 00813235 - 00813239

Order Allowing Withdrawal

Order Allowing Withdrawal

Memorandum

Memorandum

Information Filed

Information Filed

Motion to Withdraw

Motion to Withdraw

Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance; Comments: REQUEST FOR COPY OF INDICTMENT OR INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR TEN DAYS TO FILE MOTIONS

Citation Filed

Citation Filed

Citation Filed

Citation Filed

Complaint

Complaint

Court Minutes

Court Minutes; Comments: IA

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Citation Filed

Citation Filed

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2022
  • HearingHearing: Trial - Alvaro, Chad K; Location: Room 6-A On the 6th Floor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Trial - Alvaro, Chad K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Conference - Alvaro, Chad K; Location: Room 6-A On the 6th Floor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - Alvaro, Chad K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Copy Sent to Private Attorney; Comments: Document Delivery: CARLOS J MELENDEZ ESQ - Sent 7/15/2022 5:45:34 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • HearingHearing: In Jail Arraignment - Latimore, Alicia L (Actual: Latimore, Alicia L); Location: Jail 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketHEARING - In Jail Arraignment - Latimore, Alicia L (Actual: Latimore, Alicia L)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketBond Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketBond Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDUI Packet Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketMandatory Court Appearance - By Offense

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketMandatory Court Appearance - By Offense

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MELENDEZ, CARLOS J