This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 09/08/2020 at 15:19:47 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - HERNANDEZ, ANA LAURA

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - HERNANDEZ, ANA LAURA. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Apopka Branch located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Criminal Division A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-A

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Apopka Branch

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Criminal Division A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ANA LAURA HERNANDEZ

 

Court Documents

Returned Mail

Returned Mail

Transmittal to Accounting - Release Cash Bond

Transmittal to Accounting - Release Cash Bond

No Information Notice

No Information Notice

HEARING - Arraignment - Division A, Criminal

HEARING - Arraignment - Division A, Criminal

BOND - Charge 1 Cash Bond 804439

BOND - Charge 1 Cash Bond 804439

Complaint

Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2020
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-No Bill/No Information Arraignment - Division A, Criminal 70588182; Location: Apopka Courtroom A-9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-No Bill/No Information Arraignment - Division A, Criminal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: BUSTAMANTE, BRISA; Amount: -500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransmittal to Accounting - Release Cash Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketBond Discharged; Comments: 804439

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Cash Bond 804439

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNo Information Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketBond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Cash Bond 804439

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less