This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 12/14/2021 at 15:09:33 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - HAYES, NATHANIEL ALEXANDER

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - HAYES, NATHANIEL ALEXANDER. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Ocoee Branch located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Adam McGinnis. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-W

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Adam McGinnis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

NATHANIEL ALEXANDER HAYES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

BRICE AIKENS

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint

NOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

NOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

Waiver of Appearance at PreTrial Conference

Waiver of Appearance at PreTrial Conference

Information Filed

Information Filed

Memorandum

Memorandum

Notice Setting Hearing

Notice Setting Hearing

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Provision of Witness List

Notice of Provision of Witness List

HEARING - Virtual Pre-Trial Conference - McGinnis, Adam (Actual: McGinnis, Adam)

HEARING - Virtual Pre-Trial Conference - McGinnis, Adam (Actual: McGinnis, Adam)

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • HearingHearing: Virtual Pre-Trial Conference - McGinnis, Adam (Actual: McGinnis, Adam) 79031169; Location: Room 4-E On The 4th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketDisposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketWaiver of Speedy Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketCase Held in Abeyance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketDefendant Referred to PreTrial Diversion; Comments: You will Receive a Letter from Pre-Trial Diversion with Further Instructions.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING - Virtual Pre-Trial Conference - McGinnis, Adam (Actual: McGinnis, Adam)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Provision of Witness List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Supplemental Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Arraignment - Johnson, David P; Location: Ocoee Courtroom W-9

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Copy Sent to Bondsman; Comments: Document Delivery: MONCRIEF BONDING AGENCY - Sent 11/15/2021 12:29:19 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Copy Sent to Private Attorney; Comments: Document Delivery: BRICE L AIKENS ESQ - Sent 11/15/2021 12:16:17 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Setting Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of Appearance at PreTrial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2021
  • DocketBond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2021
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond U521218756

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIKENS, BRICE