This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/25/2021 at 13:30:31 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - HARRINGTON, MICHON FITZGERALD

Case Summary

On 08/23/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - HARRINGTON, MICHON FITZGERALD. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Ocoee Branch located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Adam McGinnis. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-W

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Adam McGinnis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MICHON FITZGERALD HARRINGTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

Plea Agreement Form

Plea Agreement Form

Order of Disposition

Order of Disposition

HEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - McGinnis, Adam (Actual: McGinnis, Adam)

HEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - McGinnis, Adam (Actual: McGinnis, Adam)

Court Minutes

Court Minutes; Comments: IA

Arrest Affidavit

Arrest Affidavit

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

HEARING - Virtual Pre-Trial Conference - McGinnis, Adam (Actual: McGinnis, Adam)

HEARING - Virtual Pre-Trial Conference - McGinnis, Adam (Actual: McGinnis, Adam)

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Notice Setting Hearing

Notice Setting Hearing

Written Plea of Not Guilty; Waiver of Arraignment

Written Plea of Not Guilty; Waiver of Arraignment

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Provision of Witness List

Notice of Provision of Witness List

Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

Order Granting

Order Granting; Comments: ROR

Order

Order; Comments: Granting ROR

Motion for Release on Recognizance

Motion for Release on Recognizance

Court Minutes

Court Minutes; Comments: IA

Complaint

Complaint

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond U5-20908570

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Conference - McGinnis, Adam (Actual: McGinnis, Adam) 73200774; Location: Room 4-E On The 4th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 439.28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlea Agreement Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCourt Ordered Payment Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketDisposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketPay Balance Due; Comments: by: 02/03/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCase Closed as to All Counts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Disposition

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROR Form - Orange County Corrections

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Comments: Granting ROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Release on Recognizance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes; Comments: IA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketFirst Appearance Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAdvice to Defendant, First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOut on Bond and Non-Monetary Release Form; Comments: 2019-CF17607-A-O

    Read MoreRead Less