This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 06/06/2022 at 15:05:27 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - HARLOW, GEORGE CHRISTOPHER

Case Summary

On 04/07/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - HARLOW, GEORGE CHRISTOPHER. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Tarlika Navarro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Tarlika Navarro

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

GEORGE CHRISTOPHER HARLOW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

DAVID BIGNEY

OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

Waiver of Appearance at PreTrial Conference

Waiver of Appearance at PreTrial Conference

Notice Cancellation of Hearing

Notice Cancellation of Hearing

BOND - Charge 2 Surety Bond U521341513

BOND - Charge 2 Surety Bond U521341513

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond E1425021281903

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond E1425021281903

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel

Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel

Motion to Reduce, Modify, or Set Bond

Motion to Reduce, Modify, or Set Bond

Motion to Withdraw

Motion to Withdraw

Demand

Demand; Comments: FOR EXCULPATORY INFORMATION

Demand for Disclosure

Demand for Disclosure; Comments: OF CRIMINAL RECORDS

Notice

Notice; Comments: FOR DEFENSE DISCOVERY

Notice of Discovery

Notice of Discovery

NOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

NOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

Complaint

Complaint

Application for Determining Indigent Status

Application for Determining Indigent Status

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Notice of Invocation of Constitutional Rights

Notice of Invocation of Constitutional Rights

Court Minutes

Court Minutes; Comments: IA

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of Appearance at PreTrial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • HearingHearing: Motion - LeBlanc, Bob; Location: Room 19-D on the 19th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Motion - LeBlanc, Bob

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Cancellation of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2022
  • DocketBond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2022
  • DocketBond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - Charge 2 Surety Bond U521341513

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond E1425021281903

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Comments: FOR DEFENSE DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • HearingHearing: Hearing; Location: Jail 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Determining Indigent Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAdvice to Defendant, First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Invocation of Constitutional Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes; Comments: IA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID BIGNEY