This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/22/2020 at 15:21:27 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - GRIEVOUS, MAYLING M

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - GRIEVOUS, MAYLING M. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Criminal Division A and Faye L Allen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Criminal Division A

Faye L Allen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MAYLING M GRIEVOUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

HEARING - In Jail Arraignment - Carter, Amy J (Actual: Carter, Amy J)

HEARING - In Jail Arraignment - Carter, Amy J (Actual: Carter, Amy J)

Information Filed

Information Filed

Memorandum

Memorandum

Court Minutes

Court Minutes; Comments: IA

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Complaint

Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2020
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Conference - Allen, Faye L; Location: Room 4-A On The 4th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - Allen, Faye L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • HearingHearing: In Jail Arraignment - Carter, Amy J (Actual: Carter, Amy J) 72046961; Location: Jail 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketPer the Court:; Comments: This hearing will be held VIRTUALLY. If you have any further questions regarding your virtual hearing, please contact Juanita Bell, Judicial Assistant at ctjajb5@ocnjcc.org. It is your responsibility to contact the Judicial Assistant at least two business days prior to your hearing to confirm they have your correct email address.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketPer the Court:; Comments: Case to remain in Division 85

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING - In Jail Arraignment - Carter, Amy J (Actual: Carter, Amy J)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes; Comments: IA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketFirst Appearance Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAdvice to Defendant, First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less