This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/22/2020 at 15:21:39 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - JACOB, GILBERT

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - JACOB, GILBERT. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Criminal Division A and Wayne J Shoemaker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Criminal Division A

Wayne J Shoemaker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

JACOB GILBERT

GILBERT JACOB

JACOB GILBERT AKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

Nolle Prosequi

Nolle Prosequi

HEARING - Arraignment - Division A, Criminal

HEARING - Arraignment - Division A, Criminal

Memorandum

Memorandum

HEARING - Arraignment - Division A, Criminal

HEARING - Arraignment - Division A, Criminal

Release Order

Release Order

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

No Contact Order

No Contact Order

Court Minutes

Court Minutes; Comments: IA

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Complaint

Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • HearingHearing: Arraignment - Shoemaker, Wayne J 71677402; Location: Room 7-C On The 7th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • HearingHearing: Arraignment - Shoemaker, Wayne J 71521838; Location: Room 7-C On The 7th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: -50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketWritten Plea of Not Guilty; Waiver of Arraignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING - Arraignment - Shoemaker, Wayne J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING - Arraignment - Shoemaker, Wayne J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketDisposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNolle Prosequi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketInformation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketFirst Appearance Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNo Contact Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes; Comments: IA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAdvice to Defendant, First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less