This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 12/14/2021 at 15:09:27 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - FORBES, SYLENE SYNTHELMO JR

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - FORBES, SYLENE SYNTHELMO JR. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Ocoee Branch located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Steve Jewett. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-W

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Steve Jewett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SYLENE SYNTHELMO JR FORBES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

Court Minutes

Court Minutes; Comments: IA

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond U521278827

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond U521278827

Order Revoking PreTrial Release-Ordering PreTrial Detention

Order Revoking PreTrial Release-Ordering PreTrial Detention

HEARING - Arraignment - Jewett, Evellen H (Actual: Jewett, Evellen H)

HEARING - Arraignment - Jewett, Evellen H (Actual: Jewett, Evellen H)

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

No Information Notice

No Information Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Conference - Jewett, Steve; Location: Room 4-B On The 4th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: -50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - Jewett, Steve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNo Information Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • HearingHearing: Arraignment - Jewett, Evellen H (Actual: Jewett, Evellen H) 78778001; Location: Ocoee Courtroom W-9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketPer the Court:; Comments: PD waives appearance for defendant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketPer the Court:; Comments: This hearing will be held VIRTUALLY. If you have any further questions regarding your virtual hearing, please contact Jamee Knowles, Judicial Assistant at ctjajk1@ocnjcc.org. It is your responsibility to contact the Judicial Assistant at least two business days prior to your hearing to confirm they have your correct email address.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING - Arraignment - Jewett, Evellen H (Actual: Jewett, Evellen H)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketBond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond U521278827

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • HearingHearing: Hearing - Gibson, Elizabeth; Location: Jail 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketFirst Appearance Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAdvice to Defendant, First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes; Comments: IA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketHEARING - Hearing - Gibson, Elizabeth

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less