This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 02/26/2022 at 08:05:56 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - FLORESGOMEZ, MIGUEL

Case Summary

On 05/16/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - FLORESGOMEZ, MIGUEL. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Ocoee Branch located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wayne J Shoemaker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-W

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wayne J Shoemaker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MIGUEL FLORESGOMEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

Court Minutes

Court Minutes; Comments: IA

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

No Contact Order

No Contact Order

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond U5-21134701

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond U5-21134701

Release Order

Release Order; Comments: PRETRIAL RELEASE SUPERVISION

Complaint

Complaint

HEARING - Arraignment - DuBois, Eric H (Actual: DuBois, Eric H)

HEARING - Arraignment - DuBois, Eric H (Actual: DuBois, Eric H)

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Order Appointing Public Defender

Order Appointing Public Defender

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

No Information Notice

No Information Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-No Bill/No Information Pre-Trial Conference - Shoemaker, Wayne J; Location: Room 7-C On The 7th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-No Bill/No Information Pre-Trial Conference - Shoemaker, Wayne J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: -50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: -50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond U5-21134701

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNo Information Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Copy to Bondsman; Comments: Document Delivery: Recipient: MONCRIEF BONDING AGENCY Sent, Jun 17 2021 4:28PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • HearingHearing: Arraignment - DuBois, Eric H (Actual: DuBois, Eric H) 75643999; Location: Ocoee Courtroom W-9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Comments: PRETRIAL RELEASE SUPERVISION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketBond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond U5-21134701

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketFirst Appearance Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNo Contact Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAdvice to Defendant, First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes; Comments: IA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less