This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 02/25/2022 at 19:28:27 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - FIELDING, TIMOTHY RIVES

Case Summary

On 04/11/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - FIELDING, TIMOTHY RIVES. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Ocoee Branch located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wayne J Shoemaker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-W

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wayne J Shoemaker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

TIMOTHY RIVES FIELDING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DAVID BIGNEY

 

Court Documents

Nolle Prosequi

Nolle Prosequi

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice Setting Hearing

Notice Setting Hearing

Memorandum

Memorandum

Information Filed

Information Filed

Complaint

Complaint

Order Allowing Withdrawal

Order Allowing Withdrawal; Comments: PD

Motion to Withdraw

Motion to Withdraw

Complaint

Complaint

Release Order

Release Order; Comments: Pretrial Release

Waiver of Appearance

Waiver of Appearance; Comments: at Pre-trial Conference

Demand for Exculpatory Information

Demand for Exculpatory Information

Demand for Disclosure

Demand for Disclosure; Comments: of Criminal Records

Notice of Discovery

Notice of Discovery; Comments: Written

Notice of Discovery

Notice of Discovery

NOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

NOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

No Contact Order

No Contact Order

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Conference - Shoemaker, Wayne J; Location: Room 7-C On The 7th Floor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Conference - Shoemaker, Wayne J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNolle Prosequi

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Supplemental Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Arraignment - Johnson, David P; Location: Ocoee Courtroom W-9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Arraignment - Johnson, David P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Copy Sent to Private Attorney; Comments: Document Delivery: DAVID ROBERT BIGNEY ESQ - Sent 5/11/2021 11:10:44 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Setting Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformation Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of Appearance; Comments: at Pre-trial Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Exculpatory Information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Disclosure; Comments: of Criminal Records

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Discovery; Comments: Written

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNo Contact Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAdvice to Defendant, First Appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes; Comments: IA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID BIGNEY