This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 02/26/2022 at 08:05:49 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - ESPINOZA, LAMBERTO

Case Summary

On 05/16/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - ESPINOZA, LAMBERTO. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Ocoee Branch located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wayne J Shoemaker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-W

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wayne J Shoemaker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

LAMBERTO ESPINOZA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

HEARING - Status Hearing - Shoemaker, Wayne J (Actual: Shoemaker, Wayne J)

HEARING - Status Hearing - Shoemaker, Wayne J (Actual: Shoemaker, Wayne J)

Demand-Notice of Intention-Claim Alibi

Demand-Notice of Intention-Claim Alibi

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Provision of Witness List

Notice of Provision of Witness List

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

HEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - Shoemaker, Wayne J (Actual: Shoemaker, Wayne J)

HEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - Shoemaker, Wayne J (Actual: Shoemaker, Wayne J)

Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

Memorandum

Memorandum

Information Filed

Information Filed

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

Order Appointing Public Defender

Order Appointing Public Defender

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

HEARING - Arraignment - DuBois, Eric H (Actual: DuBois, Eric H)

HEARING - Arraignment - DuBois, Eric H (Actual: DuBois, Eric H)

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

Complaint

Complaint

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Case Closed Prior to Hearing Trial - Shoemaker, Wayne J; Location: Room 7-C On The 7th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: -50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: -50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Case Closed Prior to Hearing Trial - Shoemaker, Wayne J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond AS1523930

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • HearingHearing: Trial - Shoemaker, Wayne J (Actual: Shoemaker, Wayne J); Location: Room 7-C On The 7th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketDisposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketState Orally Announced a Nolle Prosequi in Open Court; Comments: as to Counts: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketHEARING - Trial - Shoemaker, Wayne J (Actual: Shoemaker, Wayne J)

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Comments: PRETRIAL RELEASE SUPERVISION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketBond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond AS1523930

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketFirst Appearance Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNo Contact Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAdvice to Defendant, First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes; Comments: IA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less