This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/22/2020 at 15:21:33 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - DUMAS, ANTHONY JEROME

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - DUMAS, ANTHONY JEROME. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Criminal Division A and Andrew Bain. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Criminal Division A

Andrew Bain

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ANTHONY JEROME DUMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

Request for Administrative Transfer

Request for Administrative Transfer; Comments: TO CIRCUIT COURT

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

HEARING - Arraignment - Bain, Andrew (Actual: Bain, Andrew)

HEARING - Arraignment - Bain, Andrew (Actual: Bain, Andrew)

Returned Mail

Returned Mail

Written Plea of Not Guilty; Waiver of Arraignment

Written Plea of Not Guilty; Waiver of Arraignment

HEARING - Arraignment - Division A, Criminal

HEARING - Arraignment - Division A, Criminal

ROR Form - Orange County Corrections

ROR Form - Orange County Corrections

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

Court Minutes

Court Minutes; Comments: IA

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Complaint

Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Conference - Bain, Andrew; Location: Room 6-C On The 6th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Conference - Bain, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: -50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Administrative Transfer; Comments: TO CIRCUIT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketDisposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • HearingHearing: Arraignment - Bain, Andrew (Actual: Bain, Andrew) 71884523; Location: Room 6-C On The 6th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • HearingHearing: Arraignment - Jewett, Steve 71677398; Location: Room 4-B On The 4th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketPer the Court:; Comments: This hearing will be held VIRTUALLY. If you have any further questions regarding your virtual hearing, please contact Ashley Figueroa, Judicial Assistant at ctjaaf1@ocnjcc.org. It is your responsibility to contact the Judicial Assistant at least two business days prior to your hearing to confirm they have your correct email address.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING - Arraignment - Bain, Andrew (Actual: Bain, Andrew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING - Arraignment - Jewett, Steve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWritten Plea of Not Guilty; Waiver of Arraignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROR Form - Orange County Corrections

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes; Comments: IA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketFirst Appearance Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAdvice to Defendant, First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less