This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 01/26/2019 at 11:04:29 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - DIAZTORRES, ADRIAN A

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - DIAZTORRES, ADRIAN A. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is John Marshall Kest. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

John Marshall Kest

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ADRIAN A DIAZTORRES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond AA19544779

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond AA19544779

First Appearance Information Sheet

First Appearance Information Sheet

Court Minutes

Court Minutes; Comments: IA

Complaint

Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2019
  • Bond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond AA19544779

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • First Appearance Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Court Minutes; Comments: IA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less