This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 02/26/2022 at 11:10:23 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - CRISP, CHARMAYNE JALENE

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - CRISP, CHARMAYNE JALENE. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Ocoee Branch located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Faye L Allen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-W

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Faye L Allen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

CHARMAYNE JALENE CRISP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Change of Address

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

HEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - Allen, Faye L (Actual: Allen, Faye L)

HEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - Allen, Faye L (Actual: Allen, Faye L)

Notice of Provision of Witness List

Notice of Provision of Witness List

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

Pre-Trial Diversion Rejection

Pre-Trial Diversion Rejection

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

HEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - Allen, Faye L (Actual: Allen, Faye L)

HEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - Allen, Faye L (Actual: Allen, Faye L)

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

HEARING - Arraignment - Bigney, Jeanette D (Actual: Bigney, Jeanette D)

HEARING - Arraignment - Bigney, Jeanette D (Actual: Bigney, Jeanette D)

Arrest Affidavit

Arrest Affidavit; Comments: LAKE COUNTY

Capias Returned Executed

Capias Returned Executed; Comments: 6/26/2021

HEARING - Arraignment - Division A, Criminal

HEARING - Arraignment - Division A, Criminal

Electronic Copy to Bondsman

Electronic Copy to Bondsman; Comments: Document Delivery: Recipient: BELTON BAIL BONDS, INC. Sent, Jul 13 2021 12:19PM

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond 5626281759

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond 5626281759

Order

Order; Comments: ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Conference - Allen, Faye L (Actual: Allen, Faye L) 80098535; Location: Room 4-A On The 4th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketWaiver of Speedy Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCase Held in Abeyance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDefendant Referred to PreTrial Diversion; Comments: You will Receive a Letter from Pre-Trial Diversion with Further Instructions. You will maintain an updated address with the Clerk's office and with Pre-Trial Diversion through the entire process.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - Allen, Faye L (Actual: Allen, Faye L)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Provision of Witness List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Supplemental Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Copy Sent to Bondsman; Comments: Document Delivery: BELTON BAIL BONDS, INC. - Sent 1/18/2022 1:17:16 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCapias Issued Ret: Inst Bond $

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • HearingHearing: Arraignment - DuBois, Eric H (Actual: DuBois, Eric H) 75645054; Location: Ocoee Courtroom W-9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketFailure to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketIssue Capias

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketWaiver of Speedy Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING - Arraignment - DuBois, Eric H (Actual: DuBois, Eric H)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less