This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/25/2021 at 03:09:34 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - COLON RIVERA, MARJORIE MICHELLE

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - COLON RIVERA, MARJORIE MICHELLE. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Ocoee Branch located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew Bain. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-W

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Andrew Bain

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MARJORIE MICHELLE COLON RIVERA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

Capias Issued Ret: Inst Bond $

Capias Issued Ret: Inst Bond $

Returned Mail

Returned Mail

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

HEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - Bain, Andrew (Actual: Bain, Andrew)

HEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - Bain, Andrew (Actual: Bain, Andrew)

Notice of Provision of Witness List

Notice of Provision of Witness List

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Intent

Notice of Intent

Notice Setting Hearing

Notice Setting Hearing

Written Plea of Not Guilty; Waiver of Arraignment

Written Plea of Not Guilty; Waiver of Arraignment

Memorandum

Memorandum

Information Filed

Information Filed

Complete Case Transferred

Complete Case Transferred; Comments: From 2020-CF-9055-A-O

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCapias Issued Ret: Inst Bond $

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Conference - Bain, Andrew (Actual: Bain, Andrew) 71454400; Location: Room 6-C On The 6th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketRevoke Release

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketFailure to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketIssue Capias

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketWaiver of Speedy Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - Bain, Andrew (Actual: Bain, Andrew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Provision of Witness List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Supplemental Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Intent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled In Jail Arraignment - Wish, Carly S; Location: Jail 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled In Jail Arraignment - Wish, Carly S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Setting Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWritten Plea of Not Guilty; Waiver of Arraignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplete Case Transferred; Comments: From 2020-CF-9055-A-O

    Read MoreRead Less