This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 05/24/2022 at 15:02:49 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - COLEMAN, JASMINE KENSHA

Case Summary

On 03/25/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - COLEMAN, JASMINE KENSHA. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Bob LeBlanc. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Bob LeBlanc

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

JASMINE KENSHA COLEMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DAVID BIGNEY

 

Court Documents

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond U5-2132617

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond U5-2132617

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance

Notice of Discovery

Notice of Discovery

Notice

Notice; Comments: FOR DEFENSE DISCOVERY

Demand for Disclosure

Demand for Disclosure

Demand

Demand; Comments: FOR EXCULPATORY INFORMATION

Waiver of Appearance

Waiver of Appearance

Information Filed

Information Filed

Memorandum

Memorandum

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand; Comments: FOR EXCULPATORY INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Comments: FOR DEFENSE DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2022
  • DocketBond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond U5-2132617

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID BIGNEY