This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/03/2022 at 19:58:39 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - CASTANEDA, JENNIFER

Case Summary

On 10/22/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - CASTANEDA, JENNIFER. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Patricia L Strowbridge. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-O

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Patricia L Strowbridge

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

JENNIFER CASTANEDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

JOSE TORROELLA

 

Court Documents

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

Court Minutes

Court Minutes; Comments: IA

Complaint

Complaint

NOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

NOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

BOND - Charge 1 Cash Bond 810372

BOND - Charge 1 Cash Bond 810372

BOND - Charge 2 Cash Bond 810373

BOND - Charge 2 Cash Bond 810373

Motion to Withdraw

Motion to Withdraw

Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel

Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel; Comments: PD

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel; Comments: PD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Withdraw

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketBond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketBond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - Charge 2 Cash Bond 810373

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Cash Bond 810372

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes; Comments: IA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAdvice to Defendant, First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2021
  • DocketFirst Appearance Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TORROELLA, JOSE F