This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 02/26/2022 at 08:30:05 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - CARRILLO, JASMINE

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - CARRILLO, JASMINE. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Ocoee Branch located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Evellen H Jewett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-W

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Evellen H Jewett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

JASMINE CARRILLO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

LEROY COSTNER

 

Court Documents

Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel

Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel

Motion to Withdraw

Motion to Withdraw

Pre-Trial Diversion Rejection

Pre-Trial Diversion Rejection; Comments: Forwarded to JA

Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Change of Address

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

HEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - Jewett, Evellen H (Actual: Jewett, Evellen H)

HEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - Jewett, Evellen H (Actual: Jewett, Evellen H)

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Order for Continuance Granted

Order for Continuance Granted

Motion for Continuance

Motion for Continuance

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Provision of Witness List

Notice of Provision of Witness List

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Summons Issued

Summons Issued

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

HEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - Jewett, Evellen H (Actual: Jewett, Evellen H)

HEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - Jewett, Evellen H (Actual: Jewett, Evellen H)

Information Filed

Information Filed

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Withdraw

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDisposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Diversion Rejection; Comments: Forwarded to JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Conference - Jewett, Evellen H (Actual: Jewett, Evellen H) 78136845; Location: Room 9-C On The 9th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketDisposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketPer the Court:; Comments: Defendant to Keep Court File Updated of Any Address Changes at All Times.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketWaiver of Speedy Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCase Held in Abeyance

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - Jewett, Evellen H (Actual: Jewett, Evellen H)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Arraignment - DuBois, Eric H; Location: Ocoee Courtroom W-9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Arraignment - DuBois, Eric H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of Appearance at PreTrial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Copy Sent to Private Attorney; Comments: Document Delivery: LEROY E COSTNER ESQ - Sent 5/26/2021 3:07:34 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Setting Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less