This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 09/08/2020 at 15:19:52 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - BUCKLEY, TIMOTHY JOSEPH

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - BUCKLEY, TIMOTHY JOSEPH. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Apopka Branch located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Criminal Division A and David P Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-A

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Apopka Branch

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Criminal Division A

David P Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

TIMOTHY JOSEPH BUCKLEY

 

Court Documents

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

HEARING - Arraignment - Johnson, David P (Actual: Johnson, David P)

HEARING - Arraignment - Johnson, David P (Actual: Johnson, David P)

Returned Mail

Returned Mail

Electronic Copy to Bondsman

Electronic Copy to Bondsman; Comments: Document Delivery: Recipient: JOE VON WALDNER BAIL BONDS Sent, Aug 14 2020 12:31PM

Information Filed

Information Filed

Memorandum

Memorandum

Complaint

Complaint

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond AS5 1351128

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond AS5 1351128

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Conference - Johnson, David P; Location: Room 6-B On The 6th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - Johnson, David P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • HearingHearing: Arraignment - Johnson, David P (Actual: Johnson, David P) 71231254; Location: Room 4-D On The 4th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketWaiver of Speedy Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketPer the Court:; Comments: This Hearing will be held VIRTUALLY. If you have any further questions regarding your virtual hearing, please contact Judicial Assistant, Leslie Salas-Fandino at Ctjals2@ocnjcc.org. It is your responsibility to contact the Judicial Assistant at least two business days prior to your hearing to confirm they have your correct email address.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Division; Comments: 61

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING - Arraignment - Johnson, David P (Actual: Johnson, David P)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Setting Hearing; Comments: Arrangment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Copy to Bondsman; Comments: Document Delivery: Recipient: JOE VON WALDNER BAIL BONDS Sent, Aug 14 2020 12:31PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketTo Be Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2020
  • DocketBond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond AS5 1351128

    Read MoreRead Less