This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/22/2020 at 15:21:58 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - BOSHART, GRETCHYN KAY

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - BOSHART, GRETCHYN KAY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Criminal Division A and Andrew L Cameron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Criminal Division A

Andrew L Cameron

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

GRETCHYN KAY BOSHART

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

DANIEL TUMARKIN

 

Court Documents

Motion to Withdraw

Motion to Withdraw

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Electronic Copy to Bondsman

Electronic Copy to Bondsman; Comments: Document Delivery: Recipient: MONCRIEF BONDING AGENCY Sent, Oct 27 2020 4:56PM

Information Filed

Information Filed

Memorandum

Memorandum

Warrant Returned Served

Warrant Returned Served

Release Order

Release Order; Comments: PTR Release Supervision

Arrest Affidavit

Arrest Affidavit; Comments: VIOL PTR

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond U5-20996652

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond U5-20996652

Affidavit of Violation of Pretrial Release

Affidavit of Violation of Pretrial Release; Comments: Original and 2 copies sent to Warrants.

NOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

NOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,; Comments: REQUEST FOR COPY OF CHARGE

Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

Release Order

Release Order

Court Minutes

Court Minutes; Comments: IA

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Complaint

Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Conference - Cameron, Andrew L 71957152; Location: Room 9-B On The 9th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - Cameron, Andrew L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Withdraw

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Arraignment - Division A, Criminal; Location: Courtroom To Be Determined

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Arraignment - Division A, Criminal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Supplemental Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Copy to Private Attorney; Comments: Document Delivery: Recipient: DANIEL W TUMARKIN ESQ Sent, Oct 27 2020 11:25PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Copy to Bondsman; Comments: Document Delivery: Recipient: MONCRIEF BONDING AGENCY Sent, Oct 27 2020 4:56PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Violation of Pretrial Release; Comments: Original and 2 copies sent to Warrants.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,; Comments: REQUEST FOR COPY OF CHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes; Comments: IA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketFirst Appearance Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAdvice to Defendant, First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less