This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 02/25/2022 at 22:40:14 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - BERON, JOSEPH

Case Summary

On 04/20/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - BERON, JOSEPH. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Ocoee Branch located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wayne J Shoemaker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-W

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wayne J Shoemaker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

JOSEPH BERON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER, ESQUIRE

 

Court Documents

Nolle Prosequi

Nolle Prosequi

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

HEARING - Trial - Shoemaker, Wayne J (Actual: Shoemaker, Wayne J)

HEARING - Trial - Shoemaker, Wayne J (Actual: Shoemaker, Wayne J)

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

HEARING - Status Hearing - Shoemaker, Wayne J (Actual: Shoemaker, Wayne J)

HEARING - Status Hearing - Shoemaker, Wayne J (Actual: Shoemaker, Wayne J)

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Memorandum

Memorandum

Information Filed

Information Filed

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

HEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - Shoemaker, Wayne J (Actual: Shoemaker, Wayne J)

HEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - Shoemaker, Wayne J (Actual: Shoemaker, Wayne J)

Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

Order Declaring Defendant Indigent and Appointing Counsel

Order Declaring Defendant Indigent and Appointing Counsel

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

HEARING - In Jail Arraignment - Blechman, Deb S (Actual: Blechman, Deb S)

HEARING - In Jail Arraignment - Blechman, Deb S (Actual: Blechman, Deb S)

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

HEARING - Arraignment - Johnson, David P (Actual: Johnson, David P)

HEARING - Arraignment - Johnson, David P (Actual: Johnson, David P)

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNolle Prosequi

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • HearingHearing: Trial - Shoemaker, Wayne J (Actual: Shoemaker, Wayne J) 76652577; Location: Room 7-C On The 7th Floor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDisposition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketRelease Defendant as to This Case Only

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketState Orally Announced a Nolle Prosequi in Open Court; Comments: as to Counts: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING - Trial - Shoemaker, Wayne J (Actual: Shoemaker, Wayne J)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • HearingHearing: Status Hearing - Shoemaker, Wayne J (Actual: Shoemaker, Wayne J) 76129310; Location: Room 7-C On The 7th Floor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING - Status Hearing - Shoemaker, Wayne J (Actual: Shoemaker, Wayne J)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING - In Jail Arraignment - Blechman, Deb S (Actual: Blechman, Deb S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • HearingHearing: Arraignment - Johnson, David P (Actual: Johnson, David P) 74978864; Location: Ocoee Courtroom W-9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketDefendant in OCJ; Comments: Clerk's Office to Reset for In Jail Arraignment.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING - Arraignment - Johnson, David P (Actual: Johnson, David P)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformation Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less