This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/22/2020 at 15:21:46 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - BARTLEY, ERIC

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - BARTLEY, ERIC. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Criminal Division A and Wayne J Shoemaker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Criminal Division A

Wayne J Shoemaker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ERIC BARTLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

No Information Notice

No Information Notice

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

No Contact Order

No Contact Order

Court Minutes

Court Minutes; Comments: IA

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Out on Bond and Non-Monetary Release Form

Out on Bond and Non-Monetary Release Form; Comments: 2020CF5335AO

Complaint

Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: -50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNo Information Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketFirst Appearance Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNo Contact Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes; Comments: IA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAdvice to Defendant, First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOut on Bond and Non-Monetary Release Form; Comments: 2020CF5335AO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less