This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/05/2023 at 03:49:47 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - BARRETT, ALAIN HAKEEM

Case Summary

On 12/13/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - BARRETT, ALAIN HAKEEM. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark S Blechman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Mark S Blechman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ALAIN HAKEEM BARRETT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DAVID BIGNEY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Provision of Witness List

Notice of Provision of Witness List

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Evidence Control Sheet

Evidence Control Sheet

Notice of Provision of Witness List

Notice of Provision of Witness List

Court Minutes

Court Minutes; Comments: Count 1 and 2: The State of Florida asserted proof is evident, presumption great. The Court conducted an Arthur Hearing and found that proof is evident, presumption is great. The Court declined to exercise it's discretion to set a bond; therefore bond are to remain set at none. Defense Motion to Set Bond as to Counts 3, 4 and 5 is hereby granted with GPS monitoring at own expense: Count 3) Bond is Set at $20,000.00 (Twenty Thousand Dollars) Count 4) Bond is Set at $10,000.00 (Ten Thousand Dollars) Count 5) Bond is Set at $1,000.00 (One Thousand Dollars) with the following conditions of release: ~ Abide by curfew: 7:00 a.m. to 7:00 p.m. , 7 days a week. ~ Absolutely no contact whatsoever, directly or indirectly with the victim. ~ Do not own or possess any weapons or firearms. ~ Surrender United States and Jamaican passports to the Clerk of the Court prior to release. Dates are to remain as previously set.

Notice of Provision of Witness List

Notice of Provision of Witness List

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Order Setting Pre-Trial Conference

Order Setting Pre-Trial Conference

Motion to Set Bond

Motion to Set Bond

Memorandum

Memorandum

Information Filed

Information Filed

Warrant Returned Served

Warrant Returned Served

Demand

Demand; Comments: FOR EXCULPATORY INFORMATION

Demand for Disclosure

Demand for Disclosure; Comments: OF CRIMINAL RECORDS

Notice of Discovery

Notice of Discovery

Notice of Discovery

Notice of Discovery

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2023
  • HearingHearing: Trial - Blechman, Mark S; Location: Room 18-D On The 18th Floor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketHEARING - Trial - Blechman, Mark S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • HearingHearing: Trial Management Conference - Blechman, Mark S; Location: Room 18-D On The 18th Floor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketHEARING - Trial Management Conference - Blechman, Mark S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Conference - Blechman, Mark S; Location: Room 18-D On The 18th Floor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - Blechman, Mark S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Provision of Witness List

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Supplemental Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvidence Control Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Provision of Witness List

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2022
  • DocketFirst Appearance Information Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • HearingHearing: Hearing; Location: Jail 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAdvice to Defendant, First Appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes; Comments: IA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArrest Affidavit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketWarrant/Capias Issued - Non Public

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWarrant Issued Returnable Instanter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit to Issue Warrant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less