This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 09/07/2022 at 15:09:23 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - APONTE JR, RAMON

Case Summary

On 07/08/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - APONTE JR, RAMON. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Chad K Alvaro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-O

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Chad K Alvaro

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

RAMON APONTE JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

ADAM POLLACK

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketWaiver of Appearance at PreTrial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketNOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2022
  • DocketBond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2022
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond U521372479

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAM POLLACK