This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/22/2020 at 15:20:33 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - ANDERSON, WILLIE JUNIOR

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - ANDERSON, WILLIE JUNIOR. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Apopka Branch located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Criminal Division A and Wayne J Shoemaker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-A

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Apopka Branch

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Criminal Division A

Wayne J Shoemaker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

WILLIE JUNIOR ANDERSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

Notice of Provision of Witness List

Notice of Provision of Witness List

Notice

Notice; Comments: of Prior Convictions and Criminal History

Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

HEARING - Arraignment - McGinnis, Adam (Actual: McGinnis, Adam)

HEARING - Arraignment - McGinnis, Adam (Actual: McGinnis, Adam)

Information Filed

Information Filed

Memorandum

Memorandum

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond U5-20983335

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond U5-20983335

No Contact Order

No Contact Order

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

Court Minutes

Court Minutes; Comments: IA

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Court Minutes

Court Minutes; Comments: IA

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Complaint

Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2020
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Conference - Shoemaker, Wayne J; Location: Room 7-C On The 7th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - Shoemaker, Wayne J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Provision of Witness List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Comments: of Prior Convictions and Criminal History

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • HearingHearing: Arraignment - McGinnis, Adam (Actual: McGinnis, Adam) 71990360; Location: Ocoee Courtroom W-9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Copy to Bondsman; Comments: Document Delivery: Recipient: NATIVE BAIL BONDS Sent, Oct 29 2020 4:35PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketPer the Court:; Comments: This Hearing will be held VIRTUALLY. If you have any further questions regarding your virtual hearing, please contact Judicial Assistant, Sarah Sanchez at ctjass3@ocnjcc.org. It is your responsibility to contact the Judicial Assistant at least two business days prior to your hearing to confirm they have your correct email address.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING - Arraignment - McGinnis, Adam (Actual: McGinnis, Adam)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketBond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond U5-20983335

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNo Contact Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes; Comments: IA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAdvice to Defendant, First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketFirst Appearance Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes; Comments: IA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAdvice to Defendant, First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less