This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 07/19/2022 at 15:12:02 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - ALLREDGE, MURPHY SCOTT

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - ALLREDGE, MURPHY SCOTT. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elaine A Barbour. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elaine A Barbour

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MURPHY SCOTT ALLREDGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DAVID BIGNEY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond AS3K503673

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond AS3K503673

NOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

NOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

Notice of Discovery

Notice of Discovery

Notice

Notice; Comments: FOR DEFENSE DISCOVERY

Demand for Disclosure

Demand for Disclosure; Comments: OF CRIMINAL RECORDS

Demand

Demand; Comments: FOR EXCULPATORY INFORMATION

Request for Administrative Transfer

Request for Administrative Transfer; Comments: COUNTY COURT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond AS3K503673

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Administrative Transfer; Comments: COUNTY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketDisposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand; Comments: FOR EXCULPATORY INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Disclosure; Comments: OF CRIMINAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Comments: FOR DEFENSE DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2022
  • DocketBond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond AS3K503673

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • HearingHearing: Hearing; Location: Jail 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID BIGNEY