This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/25/2021 at 11:26:10 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - ALAOUI MDARHRI, HASSANE

Case Summary

On 08/21/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - ALAOUI MDARHRI, HASSANE. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Ocoee Branch located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wayne J Shoemaker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-W

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wayne J Shoemaker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

HASSANE ALAOUI MDARHRI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

Nolle Prosequi

Nolle Prosequi

Demand-Notice of Intention-Claim Alibi

Demand-Notice of Intention-Claim Alibi

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Provision of Witness List

Notice of Provision of Witness List

Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

Notice

Notice

Information Filed

Information Filed

Memorandum

Memorandum

Release Order

Release Order

Complaint

Complaint

Court Minutes

Court Minutes; Comments: IA

No Contact Order

No Contact Order

Court Minutes

Court Minutes; Comments: IA

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-No Bill/No Information Arraignment - Gibson, Elizabeth; Location: Ocoee Courtroom W-9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-No Bill/No Information Arraignment - Gibson, Elizabeth

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketDisposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNolle Prosequi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand-Notice of Intention-Claim Alibi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Supplemental Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Supplemental Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Provision of Witness List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2020
  • DocketTo Be Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes; Comments: IA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2020
  • DocketFirst Appearance Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNo Contact Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes; Comments: IA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAdvice to Defendant, First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less