This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 04/23/2023 at 16:16:10 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANYvs.CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS LLC

Case Summary

On 02/22/2023 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANYvs CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS LLC was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian Sandor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************49-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian Sandor

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

EDWIN AGUILAR AAO

Defendants

CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS LLC

SPECTRUM SUNSHINE STATE LLC DBA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TROY LOTANE

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed atty

Notice to Appear Returned Served

Notice to Appear Returned Served; Comments: Corporation Service Co

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Order Following Pre-Trial Conference

Order Following Pre-Trial Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Following Pre-Trial Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil - Chalkley, Sara (Actual: Civil, Pretrial); Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial (Actual: Civil, Pretrial); Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial (Actual: Civil, Pretrial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil - Chalkley, Sara (Actual: Civil, Pretrial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Returned Served; Comments: Corporation Service Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Lotane and Associates, P.A; Amount: -310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less